NY A05821 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that lifeguards at swimming pools, bathing beaches, and children's camps may be a minimum of fifteen years of age if directly supervised.
Title
Provides that lifeguards at swimming pools, bathing beaches, and children's camps may be a minimum of fifteen years of age if directly supervised.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.148 |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1328 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6467A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.254 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5821a |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06467 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5821A