NY A05814 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promotion of public umbilical cord blood banking.
Title
Relates to the promotion of public umbilical cord blood banking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | print number 5814a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02060 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to health