NY S02060 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the promotion of public umbilical cord blood banking.
Title
Relates to the promotion of public umbilical cord blood banking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1533 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2060A |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.571 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05814 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to health