NY A05811 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the reporting requirements relative to restitution and fair treatment standards for the office of victims services from annual to every two years; consolidates reporting requirements regarding victims service programs; requires information collected by local and state probation departments relating to victim impact statements to be included in the biennial report.
Title
Changes the reporting requirements relative to restitution and fair treatment standards for the office of victims services from annual to every two years; consolidates reporting requirements regarding victims service programs; requires information collected by local and state probation departments relating to victim impact statements to be included in the biennial report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.156 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |