NY A05800 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - 3RD READING CAL.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - 3RD READING CAL.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to submit an annual report detailing energy efficiency portfolio standard and approving programs.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority to submit an annual report detailing energy efficiency portfolio standard and approving programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | 3RD READING CAL.352 | |
2010-04-20 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7084 | |
2010-03-03 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | |
2010-03-03 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-03 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.404 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-17 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-17 | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 | |
2009-06-17 | rules report cal.402 | |
2009-06-17 | reported | |
2009-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-12 | print number 5800b | |
2009-06-12 | amend (t) and recommit to energy | |
2009-04-27 | print number 5800a | |
2009-04-27 | amend and recommit to energy | |
2009-02-20 | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S7084 (Same As) 2010-04-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5800B