NY A05794 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - recommitted to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - recommitted to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an election district to be created, consolidated, divided or altered by the board of elections in 2021 in certain counties that made temporary amendments to its rules regarding the election of county committee members.
Title
Prohibits an election district to be created, consolidated, divided or altered by the board of elections in 2021 in certain counties that made temporary amendments to its rules regarding the election of county committee members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Assembly | recommitted to election law |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.189 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.152 |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | referred to election law |