NY A05760 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 5760c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 5760c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rehabilitation of historic properties tax credit; and provides that small projects of five million dollars or less are entitled to 150% of the amount of credit allowed the taxpayer under the internal revenue code.
Title
Relates to the rehabilitation of historic properties tax credit; and provides that small projects of five million dollars or less are entitled to 150% of the amount of credit allowed the taxpayer under the internal revenue code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | print number 5760c |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | print number 5760b |
2019-08-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-07-17 | Assembly | print number 5760a |
2019-07-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03645 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 3645B