NY A05698 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s133b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s133b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a set grace period for the use of credit card reward points when an account is modified, cancelled, closed or terminated; provides ninety days shall be provided for the use of such points from the date notice of modification, cancellation, or termination of the card is provided.
Title
Relates to establishing a set grace period for the use of credit card reward points when an account is modified, cancelled, closed or terminated; provides ninety days shall be provided for the use of such points from the date notice of modification, cancellation, or termination of the card is provided.
Sponsors
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s133b |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.442 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 5698b |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 5698a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00133 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.667