NY A05698 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - approval memo.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - approval memo.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for time frames within which certain actions must be taken relating to elections, special elections and military ballots.
Title
Provides for time frames within which certain actions must be taken relating to elections, special elections and military ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate | approval memo.2 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | signed chap.4 |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-03-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.100 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3500 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.4 |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.4 |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-02-25 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03500 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5698