NY A05627 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.288
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the registration of commuter vans.
Title
Relates to the registration of commuter vans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Senate | signed chap.288 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1903 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5825B |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.664 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | print number 5627b |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | print number 5627a |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05825 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5627B