NY A05626 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of reverse mortgages that are issued under the federal home equity conversion mortgage program; prohibits the deceptive advertising and issuance of such mortgages; requires that independent counseling be provided to applicants for such mortgages; requires lenders to provide notice of duty of mortgagor to pay certain property related expenses when equity in the real property is low or depleted; prohibits foreclosure on mortgaged property based on the failure of the mortgagor to live on the property, until an inspection has been made at the property; establishes a proved right of action with treble damages for violations of such provisions.
Title
Provides for the regulation of reverse mortgages that are issued under the federal home equity conversion mortgage program; prohibits the deceptive advertising and issuance of such mortgages; requires that independent counseling be provided to applicants for such mortgages; requires lenders to provide notice of duty of mortgagor to pay certain property related expenses when equity in the real property is low or depleted; prohibits foreclosure on mortgaged property based on the failure of the mortgagor to live on the property, until an inspection has been made at the property; establishes a proved right of action with treble damages for violations of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.27 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.581 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.741 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4407 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.301 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04407 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.27