NY A05574 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s5231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - substituted by s5231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services, in coordination with the division of housing and community renewal, to conduct a study examining the increasing costs of insurance premiums and the lack of availability of insurance coverage for affordable housing developments.
Title
Directs the department of financial services, in coordination with the division of housing and community renewal, to conduct a study examining the increasing costs of insurance premiums and the lack of availability of insurance coverage for affordable housing developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s5231 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.123 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05231 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.143