NY A05573 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5573a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-19 - print number 5573a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the conducting of a study by the board of regents of feasible alternative methods of funding a college education at public four-year institutions of higher learning in New York state.
Title
Requires the conducting of a study by the board of regents of feasible alternative methods of funding a college education at public four-year institutions of higher learning in New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | print number 5573a |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00721 (Same As) 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 721A