NY A05564 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-15)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to establish a Grow: Pride of New York program for nursery dealers which use products produced in New York state.
Title
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to establish a Grow: Pride of New York program for nursery dealers which use products produced in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.534 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.251 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5064 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.262 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.116 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05064 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5564