NY A05550 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Initiates a four-year moratorium on the dissolution of any urban rental Mitchell-Lama company and establishes a Mitchell-Lama housing program study.
Title
Initiates a four-year moratorium on the dissolution of any urban rental Mitchell-Lama company and establishes a Mitchell-Lama housing program study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.393 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.427 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |