NY A05545 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to taxpayers filing under article twenty-two of the tax law to include for the purposes of the tax factor all business income attributable to a QEZE business.
Title
Relates to taxpayers filing under article twenty-two of the tax law to include for the purposes of the tax factor all business income attributable to a QEZE business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.232 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3971 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.352 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03971 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5545