NY A05533 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalties for driving with a suspended or revoked license.
Title
Increases the penalties for driving with a suspended or revoked license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01919 (Same As) 2014-05-07 - referred to transportation