NY A05523 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the town of East Hampton, county of Suffolk may only enter into grant assurances or obligations where the term is ten years or more with the state of New York or the United States or any agency, or instrumentality thereof, for airport and aviation projects at the town airport or landing field upon the adoption of a resolution subject to permissive referendum.
Title
Provides that the town of East Hampton, county of Suffolk may only enter into grant assurances or obligations where the term is ten years or more with the state of New York or the United States or any agency, or instrumentality thereof, for airport and aviation projects at the town airport or landing field upon the adoption of a resolution subject to permissive referendum.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.345 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1053 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4333 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.534 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04333 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5523