NY A05518 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prorating a veteran's exemption if such veteran moves within the same county, or in the case of a city having a population of one milion or more persons, within the same city.
Title
Relates to prorating a veteran's exemption if such veteran moves within the same county, or in the case of a city having a population of one milion or more persons, within the same city.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Mark Schroeder [D] | Asm. Robert Castelli [R] | Asm. William Boyland [D] |
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.89 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.89 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | print number 5518b |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | print number 5518a |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2011-02-23 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07701 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 7701A