NY A05516 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in outdoor areas of ticketing, boarding, or platform areas of railroad stations operated by the metropolitan transportation authority or its subsidiaries.
Title
Prohibits smoking in outdoor areas of ticketing, boarding, or platform areas of railroad stations operated by the metropolitan transportation authority or its subsidiaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | Senate | signed chap.389 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.387 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3461C |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | print number 5516c |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | print number 5516b |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-04-07 | Assembly | print number 5516a |
2011-04-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2011-02-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03461 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5516C