NY A05510 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to information concerning dense breasts.
Title
Relates to information concerning dense breasts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.402 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1148 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7369A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2016-06-02 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5510b |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.599 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | print number 5510a |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07369 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5510B