NY A05476 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.
Title
Makes certain technical amendments to the estates, powers and trusts law and the surrogate's court procedure act to reflect the provisions of the marriage equality act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.215 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.367 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00102 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY