NY A05472 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payment of independent contractors and authorizes the department of labor to investigate complaints, make claims for compensation, assess liquid damages, civil penalties and criminal penalties; authorizes the award of attorney fees and liquidated damages; excludes construction contractors.
Title
Relates to payment of independent contractors and authorizes the department of labor to investigate complaints, make claims for compensation, assess liquid damages, civil penalties and criminal penalties; authorizes the award of attorney fees and liquidated damages; excludes construction contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.684 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.256 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.317 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.317 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02556 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR