NY A05462 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a farm-to-school task force; directs the commissioner of education to develop a program to require all public schools to provide fresh foods to students in a manner that supports local agriculture and increases market opportunities for farmers from under-represented communities.
Title
Establishes a farm-to-school task force; directs the commissioner of education to develop a program to require all public schools to provide fresh foods to students in a manner that supports local agriculture and increases market opportunities for farmers from under-represented communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | print number 5462b |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | print number 5462a |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01907 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE