NY A05459 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Title
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.230 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a5459 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1612 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6048 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06048 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.230