NY A05443 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - print number 5443e
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - print number 5443e
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public schools from using a native name, logo or mascot; permits the use of current materials and uniforms until September 1, 2024; provides an exemption for Native American tribes.
Title
Prohibits public schools from using a native name, logo or mascot; permits the use of current materials and uniforms until September 1, 2024; provides an exemption for Native American tribes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | print number 5443e |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | print number 5443d |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5443c |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | print number 5443b |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | print number 5443a |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01549 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 1549E