NY A05431 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - print number 5431b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - print number 5431b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the joint commission on public ethics to provide a training course concerning anti-sexual harassment training for lobbyists; requires lobbyists to complete the course annually.
Title
Authorizes the joint commission on public ethics to provide a training course concerning anti-sexual harassment training for lobbyists; requires lobbyists to complete the course annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Assembly | print number 5431b |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 5431a |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01059 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES