NY A05420 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Title
Relates to possession of firearms on property owned by or held in trust for SUNY ESF.
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04564 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - REFERRED TO CODES