NY A05414 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s3223a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s3223a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons applying for or receiving public assistance to be interviewed by phone at social services official's option.
Title
Allows persons applying for or receiving public assistance to be interviewed by phone at social services official's option.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted by s3223a |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.133 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S03223 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.133