NY A05411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for state recognition and acknowledgement of the Montaukett Indians; provides that the Montaukett Indians shall have a chief or sachem, three tribal trustees and a tribal secretary; further provides for the qualification of voters; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for state recognition and acknowledgement of the Montaukett Indians; provides that the Montaukett Indians shall have a chief or sachem, three tribal trustees and a tribal secretary; further provides for the qualification of voters; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.331 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03691 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS