NY A05408 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Domingo Cabera to file a retroactive application for retirement with the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Authorizes Domingo Cabera to file a retroactive application for retirement with the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | print number 5408a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03924 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS