NY A05407 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax credit for the adoption of household pets from animal shelters or humane societies.
Title
Provides for a tax credit for the adoption of household pets from animal shelters or humane societies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | print number 5407a |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02894 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 2894B