NY A05400 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6582a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6582a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Woodmere, Nassau County, New York, Inc.
Title
Relates to the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Woodmere, Nassau County, New York, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6582a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.436 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 5400a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06582 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.373