NY A05395 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s4715a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s4715a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to qualifications for holding certain offices in the village of Northville in Fulton County.
Title
Relates to qualifications for holding certain offices in the village of Northville in Fulton County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4715a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.323 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.323 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 5395a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04715 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.292