NY A05373 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - amended on third reading 5373b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - amended on third reading 5373b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Title
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5373b |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.168 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.810 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.810 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | print number 5373a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09473 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - PRINT NUMBER 9473A