NY A05370 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the health emergency response data system, which collects information and statistical data relating to public health emergencies in order to assist the department of health, other government entities, health care providers, and the public in understanding and responding to public health emergencies.
Title
Relates to creating the health emergency response data system, which collects information and statistical data relating to public health emergencies in order to assist the department of health, other government entities, health care providers, and the public in understanding and responding to public health emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.246 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.246 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05732 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE