NY A05366 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To create a coordinating council to improve prevention and treatment of asthma
Title
Establishes a Minority Coordinating Council on Asthmatic Affairs within the department of health to assess the asthma risk factors for the minority citizens of our state, counties and regions; identify the existing barriers to quality asthma treatment and care among minorities; develop action steps for addressing care issues; and launch a state-wide asthma awareness campaign to educate our citizens about the disease; requires report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | held for consideration in ways and means | |
2010-02-23 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-02-09 | print number 5366a | |
2010-02-09 | amend and recommit to health | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-04-07 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-02-13 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S4157-A (Same As) 2010-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4157A