NY S04157 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4157A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4157A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Minority Coordinating Council on Asthmatic Affairs within the department of health to assess the asthma risk factors for the minority citizens of our state, counties and regions; identify the existing barriers to quality asthma treatment and care among minorities; develop action steps for addressing care issues; and launch a state-wide asthma awareness campaign to educate our citizens about the disease; requires report.
Title
Establishes a Minority Coordinating Council on Asthmatic Affairs within the department of health to assess the asthma risk factors for the minority citizens of our state, counties and regions; identify the existing barriers to quality asthma treatment and care among minorities; develop action steps for addressing care issues; and launch a state-wide asthma awareness campaign to educate our citizens about the disease; requires report.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Hiram Monserrate [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | PRINT NUMBER 4157A | |
2010-03-08 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2009-04-15 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A5366-A (Same As) 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means