NY A05353 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to raising the income cap for senior citizens applying for the enhanced STAR property tax exemption.
Title
Relates to raising the income cap for senior citizens applying for the enhanced STAR property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08732 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT