NY A05342 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Niagara Frontier Transportation Authority, the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority, the Capital District Transportation Authority and the Central New York Regional Transportation Authority and their employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Title
Requires the Niagara Frontier Transportation Authority, the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority, the Capital District Transportation Authority and the Central New York Regional Transportation Authority and their employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.227 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.195 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a5342 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.925 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s5737 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.195 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S01165 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05737 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227
S05737 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227