NY A05306 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Title
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.239 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5306b |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5306a |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-03 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.91 |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02065 (Same As) 2013-06-10 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05673 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S05673 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES