NY A05267 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the metropolitan transportation authority riders' council for persons with disabilities; provides for membership and powers and duties.
Title
Establishes the metropolitan transportation authority riders' council for persons with disabilities; provides for membership and powers and duties.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.229 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5437 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.258 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05437 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5267