NY A05263 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - substituted by s5086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - substituted by s5086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that guardians ad litem in Westchester county are considered employees for the purposes of representation and indemnification in civil actions resulting from actions taken during the scope of their employment.
Title
Establishes that guardians ad litem in Westchester county are considered employees for the purposes of representation and indemnification in civil actions resulting from actions taken during the scope of their employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Maryjane Shimsky [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s5086 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.452 |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05086 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.430