NY A05206 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Doodletown Brook to the definition of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Title
Adds Doodletown Brook to the definition of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | print number 5206b |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | print number 5206a |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05620 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - referred to ways and means