NY A05179 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - substituted by s1206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - substituted by s1206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the provisions of Lauren's law, providing for the election to or declining to elect to register in the donate life registry for organ and tissue donation.
Title
Makes permanent the provisions of Lauren's law, providing for the election to or declining to elect to register in the donate life registry for organ and tissue donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Assembly | substituted by s1206 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.215 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01206 (Same As) 2017-10-16 - SIGNED CHAP.332