NY A05156 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s5363
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates baseball as the official sport of the state of New York.
Title
Designates baseball as the official sport of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s5363 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.759 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05363 (Same As) 2021-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.318