NY A05154 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - substituted by s1809
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - substituted by s1809
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to chapter 525 of the laws of 2014 relating to encouraging community-based organizations to increase opportunities for seniors to participate in community gardens; adjusts the age of those who qualify as seniors.
Title
Makes technical corrections to chapter 525 of the laws of 2014 relating to encouraging community-based organizations to increase opportunities for seniors to participate in community gardens; adjusts the age of those who qualify as seniors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Assembly | substituted by s1809 |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.116 |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01809 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.154