NY A05119 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s5178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s5178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study aging in place in mental health housing; provides for the repeal of such task force upon expiration thereof.
Title
Establishes a task force to study aging in place in mental health housing; provides for the repeal of such task force upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s5178 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.506 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05178 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - VETOED MEMO.80