NY A05110 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - 3RD READING CAL.343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - 3RD READING CAL.343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to allow a person who will be 18 years old a the time of a presidential election to vote in primary election if 17 at the time.
Title
CONCURRENT RESOLUTION OF THE SENATE AND ASSEMBLY proposing an amendment to section 1 of article 2 of the constitution, in relation to qualifications of voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | 3RD READING CAL.343 | |
2010-06-25 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4226 | |
2010-06-24 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-24 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.128 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.128 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-12 | reported referred to judiciary | |
2010-01-06 | referred to election law | |
2009-02-10 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S4226 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5110