NY A05083 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Title
Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | print number 5083a |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S01672 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to mental health